U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00433
  • Case Name: Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. Farnsworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • May 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 11, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • May 09, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • May 05, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 24, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 24, 2016: [Appear]
  • October 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 19, 2016: [File Amicus Brief]
  • October 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 19, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 18, 2016: [File Amicus Brief]
  • October 17, 2016: [File Amicus Brief]
  • October 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 13, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 13, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 13, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 07, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 07, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 27, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 27, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.