U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00435
  • Case Name: Fullmer et al v. DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • January 03, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 29, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 28, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.