U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00432
  • Case Name: McDermott v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 22, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 12, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • November 12, 2019: [Supplement]
  • November 12, 2019: [Complaint]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Reopen Case]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Quash]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order]
  • February 13, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 17, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 17, 2016: [Consent Filed]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 28, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.