U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00434
  • Case Name: Estrada-Jasso v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 25, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.