U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00437
  • Case Name: Leytham v. Page
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 30, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2019: [Reconsideration]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2019: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Strike]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • December 20, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • December 09, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • December 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 06, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 10, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 24, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • August 20, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • August 15, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Request]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Request]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 04, 2017: [Request]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Consent Filed]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 29, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.