U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Frazier et al v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 21, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 22, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2017: [Expert Witness Disclosure]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order]
  • July 31, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 26, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [Litigation Order]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 05, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • October 03, 2016: [Consent Filed]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.