U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00438
  • Case Name: McCoy v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 06, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Response (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • October 27, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Receipt]
  • March 09, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 04, 2017: [Dismiss]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 03, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 30, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 30, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.