U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00440
  • Case Name: Doyle v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 13, 2017: [Remand]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
  • June 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 07, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 12, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 03, 2016: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • October 03, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 30, 2016: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 30, 2016: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.