U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00442
  • Case Name: Hutcheson v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 14, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [USCA Order]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • June 13, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 22, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 08, 2018: [Supplement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • December 05, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 25, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 12, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2017: [Seal]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 06, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 30, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 17, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 03, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 01, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • December 01, 2016: [Response (generic)]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order]
  • October 26, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • October 03, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.