U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00441
  • Case Name: Miniero v. Wells-Moore
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Letter]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • October 17, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 17, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 04, 2016: [Complaint]
  • October 04, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 04, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.