U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00444
  • Case Name: Kreb v. Life Flight Network, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Stay]
  • November 19, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Strike]
  • October 09, 2020: [Strike]
  • October 06, 2020: [Disqualify Judge]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Disqualify Judge]
  • September 15, 2020: [Strike]
  • September 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 10, 2020: [Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Status Report]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 20, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • August 15, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 17, 2019: [Stay]
  • July 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order]
  • May 23, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Compel]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2019: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • February 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 28, 2018: [Status Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • April 09, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 29, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 05, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 09, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 31, 2017: [Errata]
  • May 26, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 26, 2017: [Statement]
  • May 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 18, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 17, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Declaration]
  • January 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Consent Filed]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Errata]
  • October 13, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 07, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 04, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 04, 2016: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.