U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00445
  • Case Name: Heiss v. Stryker Howmedica Osteonics Corp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 19, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [ADR Plan]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • December 21, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 15, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 11, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 05, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 04, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.