U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00159
  • Case Name: Sapp v. Bartlett
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 25, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 06, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 05, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • August 08, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 04, 2017: [Seal Document]
  • August 04, 2017: [Seal]
  • August 03, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 28, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 15, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 03, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.