U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00403
  • Case Name: Durette v. Sprungl et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • December 16, 2016: [Supplement]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • October 07, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 07, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 07, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 06, 2016: [Request]
  • October 06, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.