U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00447
  • Case Name: Henry v. Carlin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 02, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 11, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • March 09, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Receipt]
  • December 05, 2016: [Consent Filed]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 07, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 07, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 07, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.