U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00448
  • Case Name: Eiselein v. University of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 04, 2017: [Dismiss]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 21, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 16, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 23, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 18, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order]
  • January 10, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 13, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • October 07, 2016: [Receipt]
  • October 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.