U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00452
  • Case Name: Ritch v. JP Development, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 10, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.