U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00450
  • Case Name: Simmons v. Rush Truck Centers of Idaho, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 17, 2017: [Compel]
  • February 07, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Status Report]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.