U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00457
  • Case Name: Western Watersheds Project v. U.S. Forest Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 03, 2017: [Settlement]
  • July 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order]
  • April 05, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2017: [Stay]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Stay]
  • February 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 13, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.