U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00454
  • Case Name: Green v. Neville et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [USCA Order]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Expedite]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 17, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • February 10, 2017: [Errata]
  • February 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Receipt]
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 15, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 12, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 12, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 12, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.