U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00453
  • Case Name: Archuleta v. Corizon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order Reopening Case]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 05, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 26, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 27, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 01, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order]
  • September 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 10, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Supplement]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 12, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Complaint]
  • October 12, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 12, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.