U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00458
  • Case Name: Zeyen v. Pocatello/Chubbuck School District #25 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 18, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 18, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 15, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Strike]
  • March 09, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • February 02, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 01, 2017: [Supplement]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • July 20, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 18, 2017: [Withdraw]
May, 2017
  • May 12, 2017: [Order]
  • May 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 27, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • April 11, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 05, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 03, 2017: [Litigation Order]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2017: [Summons Reissued]
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 21, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.