U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00455
  • Case Name: Breinholt et al v. Ocwen Loan Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 11, 2017: [Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 06, 2017: [Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 20, 2017: [Stay]
  • September 06, 2017: [Supplement]
  • September 06, 2017: [Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 06, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Disqualify Judge]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 06, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 07, 2016: [Strike]
  • December 07, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 17, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 04, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 12, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Receipt]
  • October 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.