U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00463
  • Case Name: Fry-Bailey v. Spirit Lake, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 07, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 14, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 30, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 29, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 14, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 14, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 13, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.