U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00462
  • Case Name: Anderson v. Les Schwab Tire Centers of Boise, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 26, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 14, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 29, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 25, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 22, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 25, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 25, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 13, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.