U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00465
  • Case Name: Storer v. Medical Center for Children & Adolescents et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Letter of Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 17, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 14, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 14, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 14, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.