U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00459
  • Case Name: Knight v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Clarify]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Appoint Expert]
  • January 22, 2020: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Supplement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Response to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • June 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Case Number Change]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 31, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Strike]
  • July 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2018: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 09, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 05, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Errata]
  • February 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 04, 2017: [Extension of Time to Amend]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Order]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 14, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 14, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.