U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00468
  • Case Name: Lindsey v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Return Mail]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Response (generic)]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2016: [Continue]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Filing Motion 2255]
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2016: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.