U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00466
  • Case Name: Smith v. Brooks et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Return Mail]
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Joinder]
  • November 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Alter Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 04, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Stay]
  • February 14, 2019: [Response to Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Compel]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 19, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • November 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 13, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2018: [Affidavit]
October, 2018
  • October 08, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 05, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • October 05, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • October 05, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 11, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2017: [Compel]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 29, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 21, 2017: [Letter]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 06, 2017: [Request]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 05, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 04, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • April 05, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • March 03, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 01, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Letter]
  • October 25, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 18, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 18, 2016: [Complaint]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 18, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 18, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.