U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00469
  • Case Name: Hamell et al v. Idaho County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 24, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 05, 2018: [Declaration]
  • January 05, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • July 11, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 05, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Relief]
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 07, 2017: [Vacate]
  • April 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 23, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • December 16, 2016: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 15, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order]
  • December 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 14, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Receipt]
  • October 20, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.