U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00473
  • Case Name: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Hetemi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Judgment - Default]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 20, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 11, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 08, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 08, 2017: [Default Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 21, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • April 21, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • April 21, 2017: [Default Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 03, 2017: [Vacate]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 24, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 24, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.