U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00472
  • Case Name: Hart v. McMorris
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Order]
  • February 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Return Mail]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 09, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • November 18, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 25, 2016: [Complaint]
  • October 25, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 25, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.