U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00475
  • Case Name: The American Automobile Association, Inc. v. Teague et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Declaration]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 12, 2018: [Show Cause Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • June 14, 2018: [Declaration]
  • June 14, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • May 18, 2018: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Show Cause]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • June 07, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 07, 2017: [Judgment - Default]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Default Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Clerks Entry of Default]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • November 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 27, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • October 26, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 26, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • October 25, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.