U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00346
  • Case Name: Moore v Muguira et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [USCA Order]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 09, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 03, 2018: [Reconsideration]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 26, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Response (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2018: [Response (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2018: [Letter]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Response (generic)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 27, 2017: [Request]
  • November 21, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Supplement]
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 19, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 10, 2017: [Strike]
  • October 10, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 22, 2017: [Declaration]
  • August 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • July 13, 2017: [Letter]
  • July 11, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2017: [Stay]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Waive]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Issuance]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2017: [Issuance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Waive]
  • March 06, 2017: [Letter]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [Response (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Letter]
  • January 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2016: [Compel]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 25, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.