U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00339
  • Case Name: Borgmann et al v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 03, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 19, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 05, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.