U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cv-00476
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Empire Airlines, Inc., an Idaho corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
  • October 20, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 01, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • June 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • May 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 11, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • January 09, 2017: [Jury Demand]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 28, 2016: [Errata]
  • November 28, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 14, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order]
  • October 27, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 26, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.