U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cv-00291
  • Case Name: Mubita v. North Central District Health et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 06, 2017: [USCA Order]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 30, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 27, 2016: [Reopen Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.