U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00477
  • Case Name: Aleman-Aleman v. Lynch et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 25, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 25, 2017: [Status Report]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 04, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 28, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 28, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 07, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • June 23, 2017: [Exclude]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 12, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 12, 2017: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • May 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Order]
  • April 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 20, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 10, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Status Report]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 27, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 27, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.