U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00478
  • Case Name: Williams v. Brooks et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2017: [Reopen Case]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 15, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 14, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Sever]
  • February 03, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 28, 2016: [Complaint]
  • October 28, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 28, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 28, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.