U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00481
  • Case Name: Bell v. Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Order]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 28, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2016: [Summons Issued]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.