U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00479
  • Case Name: Hoover v. Call
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 28, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2018: [Status Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • March 08, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 15, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • February 10, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 09, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • February 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 08, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 08, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • October 28, 2016: [Receipt]
  • October 28, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.