U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00480
  • Case Name: Centers et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 05, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
  • January 04, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 03, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order]
  • November 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • October 31, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 31, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 28, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.