U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00482
  • Case Name: CAO Lighting, Inc. v. Light Efficient Design et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2017: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • October 12, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Errata]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 25, 2017: [Sealed Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Seal]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • July 14, 2017: [Transfer Case]
  • July 13, 2017: [Claim]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 28, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • June 13, 2017: [Protective Order]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • January 17, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 17, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 09, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 08, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • November 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 01, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Supplement]
  • October 28, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.