U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00484
  • Case Name: Fain v. Kootenai County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Response (generic)]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 12, 2017: [Receipt]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • November 02, 2016: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • November 02, 2016: [Complaint]
  • November 02, 2016: [Supplement]
  • November 02, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.