U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cv-00161
  • Case Name: Idaho Conservation League et al v. Atlanta Gold Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Default Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Declaration]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 12, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • November 04, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 25, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • September 24, 2018: [Declaration]
  • September 24, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • September 10, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2018: [Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2018: [Supplement]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Status Report]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Status Report]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Status Report]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Status Report]
  • October 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • September 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2017: [Strike]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 26, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 26, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 25, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 25, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 25, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 17, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 13, 2017: [Strike]
  • April 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 04, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2017: [Witness List]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 08, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 08, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
  • November 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2016: [Reopen Case]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.