U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00485
  • Case Name: Friends of the Clearwater v. Probert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Transcript]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 18, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order]
  • May 16, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2017: [Amicus Curiae Appearance]
  • May 16, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 12, 2017: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • May 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order]
  • May 01, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • April 28, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
  • April 28, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 26, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 09, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2017: [Intervene]
  • March 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2017: [Intervene]
  • February 09, 2017: [Consent Filed]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 25, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • January 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 08, 2016: [Summons Reissued]
  • November 07, 2016: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 03, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 03, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.