U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00486
  • Case Name: Lancaster et al v. James B. Nutter and Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 07, 2017: [Status Report]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment]
  • May 10, 2017: [Entry of Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 17, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 17, 2017: [Stay]
  • January 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 08, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 08, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 31, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • December 22, 2016: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • December 19, 2016: [Strike]
  • December 19, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 19, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Entry of Default]
  • December 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 04, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 04, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 04, 2016: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • November 03, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 03, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.