U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00489
  • Case Name: Janicek et al v. First Fruits Holdings, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 27, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 07, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 07, 2017: [Counterclaim]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order]
  • June 09, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 09, 2017: [Stipulation]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 23, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 09, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • March 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 17, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Entry of Default]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 18, 2017: [Errata]
  • January 17, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 17, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 17, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 08, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 08, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.