U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00493
  • Case Name: Smith v. City of Nampa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 30, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 01, 2017: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • July 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 14, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 01, 2017: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
  • January 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 30, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order]
  • January 26, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 26, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 25, 2017: [Consent Filed]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 14, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.