U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00496
  • Case Name: Gordon v. Sells et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 08, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2017: [Expedite]
  • March 02, 2017: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 01, 2017: [Errata]
  • March 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 01, 2017: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Errata]
  • February 22, 2017: [Statement]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 16, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 09, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 07, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • February 07, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 03, 2017: [Declaration]
  • February 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 03, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • January 11, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 11, 2017: [Counterclaim]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 02, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2016: [Counterclaim]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • November 14, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.